Phuoc An Coffee Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Food & Beverage)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Nguyen Hoa
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
HO SY TRUNG
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
2,037
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Duong Kim Nhung
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
32,686
|
0.14 %
|
30/06/2024
|
TRAN THI LE
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
15/08/2019
|
Nguyen Huyen Tram
|
Member of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
TRAN THANH HAI
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Le Nguyen Hoa
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
HO SY TRUNG
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
2,037
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Truong Quang Tuan
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
53,701
|
0.23 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Duong Kim Nhung
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
32,686
|
0.14 %
|
30/06/2024
|