Water Supply Sewerage Construction and Investment Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Real Estate)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Van Loc
|
|
5,170
|
0.04 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Duy Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
20,000
|
0.15 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vu Doan Chung
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN DUC BON
|
Member of Management Board
|
23,870
|
0.18 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Chu Xuan Lang
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
18,170
|
0.14 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Van Loc
|
|
5,170
|
0.04 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Nguyen Duy Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
20,000
|
0.15 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Tien Dung
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Vu Doan Chung
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Tat Thang
|
Vice-chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2015
|