Khanh Hoa Power Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Huu Tam
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Cao Ky
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
43,299
|
0.07 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Tan Luc
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
2
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Sy Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2016
|
Nguyen Hai Duc
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Tuyet Hong
|
|
46,886
|
0.08 %
|
15/12/2009
|
Pham Thi Tuyet Mai
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
22/04/2009
|
Nguyen Thi Tuyet Hong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
22/04/2009
|
Nguyen Huu Tam
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thanh Lam
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
54,537
|
0.09 %
|
31/12/2021
|