ASG Corporation (HOSE | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ly Lam Duy
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Duong Duc Tinh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
8,564,634
|
9.43 %
|
30/06/2024
|
PHAM VAN HA
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
176,289
|
0.19 %
|
31/12/2021
|
NGUYEN HOANG SON
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Dang Luu Dung
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ly Lam Duy
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Duong Duc Tinh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
8,564,634
|
9.43 %
|
30/06/2024
|
PHAM VAN HA
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
176,289
|
0.19 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Dang Luu Dung
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Ly Lam Duy
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|