Viet Thang Corporation - JSC (HOSE | Personal & Household Goods)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Huu Phu
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
229,320
|
1.09 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Tran Thi Thanh Phuong
|
Member of the Management Board
|
68,000
|
0.32 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Pham Minh Tuan
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Le Thiet Hung
|
Chief Accountant
|
98,155
|
0.47 %
|
31/12/2017
|
Nguyen Phi Hung
|
Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
0
|
0 %
|
27/09/2024
|