Tay Ninh Rubber Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Chemicals)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thai Binh
|
Member of Management Board/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
3,700
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le van Chanh
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
2,600
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Phan Quoc Khai
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Hong Thai
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Dang Thi Bong
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vuong Thi Rang
|
|
2,400
|
0.01 %
|
31/12/2008
|
Nguyen Thi Huong Giang
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
27/12/2006
|
Pham Thanh Hoa
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
10,500,000
|
35.00 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Trinh Van Vinh
|
Chairman of the Board/CEO
|
3,700
|
0.01 %
|
31/12/2008
|
Hua Ngoc Hiep
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2015
|