Sai Gon Vien Dong Technology Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Basic Resources)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Bui Nam Long
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
80,942
|
0.47 %
|
30/06/2019
|
Bui Quang Khoa
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
66,550
|
0.38 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Pham Thi Nhu Ngoc
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Thu
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
374,425
|
2.16 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Bui Quang Khoa
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
99,492
|
0.57 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Bui Nam Long
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
80,942
|
0.47 %
|
30/06/2019
|
Bui Quang Khoa
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
66,550
|
0.38 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Vo Nguyen Khoi
|
Chairman of the Board
|
5,000
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Pham Thi Nhu Ngoc
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Chau Minh Thien
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|