Song Da 19 Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
NGUYEN VIET DUNG
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,100,000
|
22.00 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Nguyen Thi Thanh Bin
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
PHAM TRUNG DUNG
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Nguyen Duc Manh
|
Member of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Le Quoc Khanh
|
Member of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dinh Quang Chien
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
20/05/2016
|
Tran Viet Dung
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2013
|
NGUYEN VIET DUNG
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,100,000
|
22.00 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Tran Manh Cuong
|
Chairman of the Board
|
25,954
|
0.52 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Vu Hong Su
|
Chairman of the Board
|
17,200
|
0.34 %
|
30/06/2012
|