Song Da Urban Investment Construction And Development Joint Stock Company (HNX | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Quang Thang
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Pham Manh Khoi
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Bui Dinh Dong
|
Member of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vu Hien
|
|
970,000
|
4.85 %
|
06/07/2015
|
Tran Van Tuan
|
Chairman of the Board
|
20,000
|
0.10 %
|
15/06/2009
|
Pham Ba Ton
|
Board member
|
20,000
|
0.10 %
|
15/06/2009
|
Le Tung Hoa
|
|
5,700
|
0.03 %
|
18/08/2015
|
Do Thanh Huong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|