Song Da Joint Stock Company No 6 (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dang Quoc Bao
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
79,792
|
0.23 %
|
30/06/2024
|
LE TIEN THU
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
2,210
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2023
|
Nguyen Tuan Phat
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Minh Tuan
|
Deputy General Director /Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen The Tai
|
Person in charge of Corporate governace /Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Khac Ha
|
|
8,500
|
0.02 %
|
31/12/2011
|
To Dinh Ken
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
09/11/2010
|
Nguyen Van Tung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
164,095
|
0.47 %
|
30/06/2018
|
Dang Quoc Bao
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
79,792
|
0.23 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Ho Sy Hung
|
Member of the Management Board
|
56,860
|
0.16 %
|
31/12/2021
|