Pomina Steel Corporation (UPCOM | Basic Resources)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Duy Thai
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
869,400
|
0.31 %
|
22/01/2024
|
Do Tien Si
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
8,602,216
|
3.08 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Do Van Khanh
|
Vice Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
19/01/2024
|
Do Xuan Chieu
|
Member of the Management Board
|
1,650,480
|
0.59 %
|
25/03/2024
|
Do Hoai Khanh Linh
|
Member of the Management Board
|
542,811
|
0.19 %
|
29/03/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Duy Thai
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
869,400
|
0.31 %
|
22/01/2024
|
Do Tien Si
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
8,602,216
|
3.08 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Do Van Khanh
|
Vice Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
19/01/2024
|
Do Xuan Chieu
|
Member of the Management Board
|
1,650,480
|
0.59 %
|
25/03/2024
|
Do Hoai Khanh Linh
|
Member of the Management Board
|
542,811
|
0.19 %
|
29/03/2024
|