Nam Long Investment Corporation (HOSE | Real Estate)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Ngoc Minh
|
|
1,105,769
|
0.29 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Xuan Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
40,852,051
|
10.62 %
|
24/09/2024
|
Tran Thanh Phong
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman/Internal auditor
|
15,683,750
|
4.08 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Cao Tan Thach
|
Member of Management Board/Internal auditor
|
3,288,189
|
0.85 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Chad Ryan Ovel
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Ngoc Minh
|
|
1,105,769
|
0.29 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Xuan Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
40,852,051
|
10.62 %
|
24/09/2024
|
Tran Thanh Phong
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman/Internal auditor
|
15,683,750
|
4.08 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Cao Tan Thach
|
Member of Management Board/Internal auditor
|
3,288,189
|
0.85 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Bui Duc Khang
|
Member of Management Board
|
190,063
|
0.05 %
|
30/06/2021
|