Lam Son Suger Joint Stock Corporation (HOSE | Food & Beverage)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Van Tan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
3,838,238
|
4.79 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Trung Thanh
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
1,894,826
|
2.36 %
|
25/09/2024
|
Phung Thanh Hai
|
Member of Management Board
|
5,724
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
LE THI HUE
|
Member of Management Board/Head of Internal auditor
|
31
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Huy Hung
|
Head of Supervisors Board/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
1,144
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Van Tan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
3,838,238
|
4.79 %
|
30/06/2024
|
LE VAN TAM
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/09/2022
|
Le Trung Thanh
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
1,894,826
|
2.36 %
|
25/09/2024
|
Le Thi Tien
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
86,512
|
0.11 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Bui Xuan Sinh
|
Vice - chairman of the Board
|
33,570
|
0.04 %
|
10/10/2007
|