Hoa Binh Construction Group Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Viet Hung
|
|
1,357,680
|
0.39 %
|
27/08/2024
|
Dang Hong Anh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Le Viet Hai
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
46,987,699
|
13.53 %
|
05/08/2024
|
Le Viet Hieu
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
1,214,264
|
0.35 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Luot
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Viet Hung
|
|
1,357,680
|
0.39 %
|
27/08/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Anh Ngoc
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
10/04/2009
|
Dang Hong Anh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Le Viet Hai
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
46,987,699
|
13.53 %
|
05/08/2024
|
Nguyen Cong Phu
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Independent Member of Management Board /Internal auditor
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|