BIDV Joint Stock Securities Company (HOSE | Financial Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dao Viet Dinh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Ngo Van Dung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Chung Jea Hoon
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN THANH HUYEN
|
Member of Management Board
|
5
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Hoang Thi Minh Ngoc
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Luu Diem Cam
|
|
29,283
|
0.01 %
|
03/06/2011
|
Bui Thi Hoa
|
|
10,000
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Nguyen Van Thang
|
|
900
|
0 %
|
31/12/2012
|
Le Hong Nhung
|
|
561
|
0 %
|
31/12/2012
|
Le Ngoc Lam
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|