Bibica Corporation (HOSE | Food & Beverage)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Truong Phu Chien
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
2,000
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Khai
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Quoc Hoang
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Duc Tuyen
|
Deputy General Director
|
166
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Phan Van Thien
|
Deputy General Director
|
47
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Bang Tam
|
|
78,020
|
0.42 %
|
21/08/2007
|
Truong Phu Chien
|
Chairman of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
2,000
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Jung Woo, Lee
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2020
|
Dong Jin Park
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/03/2009
|
Hoang Tho Vinh
|
Vice - chairman of the Board/Director
|
103,265
|
0.55 %
|
31/03/2008
|