Vitaly Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Viet Thang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Vo Van Tung
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Legal Representative
|
5,200
|
0.07 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Viet Loi
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Thanh Ha
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Viet Thang
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
27/09/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Thi Thanh Thuy
|
|
243,000
|
3.04 %
|
29/04/2008
|
Nguyen Thi Hao
|
|
22,700
|
0.28 %
|
29/04/2008
|
Ha Thi Thanh Thuy
|
|
3,000
|
0.04 %
|
29/10/2009
|
Dao Thi Thoan
|
|
3,000
|
0.04 %
|
14/12/2009
|
Dinh Thi Thanh Huong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
29/04/2008
|