Vinh Son - Song Hinh Hydropower Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vo Thanh Trung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman
|
298,242
|
0.13 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Thanh
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
21,183
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Tuan Hai
|
Member of Management Board/Head of Internal auditor
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Quang Quyen
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Quach Vinh Binh
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dang Thi Hong Phuong
|
|
1,000,000
|
0.42 %
|
14/07/2005
|
Vo Thanh Trung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman
|
298,242
|
0.13 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Duc Doi
|
Board member
|
453,160
|
0.19 %
|
30/06/2012
|
Nguyen Van Thanh
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
21,183
|
0.01 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Trinh Van Tuan
|
Board member
|
0
|
0 %
|
16/04/2009
|