Vinafreight Joint Stock Company (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Bui Tuan Ngoc
|
|
49,584
|
0.16 %
|
07/12/2022
|
Chu Viet Cuong
|
|
16,800
|
0.05 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Nguyen Ngoc Nhien
|
|
566
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Ton That Hung
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Bich Lan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
120,375
|
0.38 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Bui Tuan Ngoc
|
|
49,584
|
0.16 %
|
07/12/2022
|
Chu Viet Cuong
|
|
16,800
|
0.05 %
|
31/12/2021
|
LTTH
|
|
13,740
|
0.04 %
|
16/06/2010
|
Tran Thi Binh
|
|
1,950
|
0.01 %
|
16/06/2010
|
Nguyen Ngoc Nhien
|
|
566
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|