Vietnam National Textile And Garment Group (UPCOM | Personal & Household Goods)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vuong Duc Anh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Tien Truong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,500
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Quang Nghi
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
10,003,900
|
2.00 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Xuan Dong
|
Member of Management Board
|
15,000,000
|
3.00 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Dang Vu Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
5,000
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Ve Dung
|
|
1,500
|
0 %
|
31/10/2016
|
Vuong Duc Anh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Thanh Ha
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Nguyen Duc Khiem
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/10/2016
|
PHAM PHU CUONG
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
22/06/2015
|