The Vegetexco Port Joint Stock Company (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ho Thi Cam Van
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Tran Thi Anh Tho
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,112,759
|
13.55 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN VAN TUNG
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2022
|
HOANG HAI
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Ngoc Quynh
|
Member of Management Board/Director/Director of Operation
|
416,000
|
5.06 %
|
24/09/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ho Thi Cam Van
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Tran Thi Anh Tho
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,112,759
|
13.55 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Dang Nhu Binh
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
05/04/2017
|
Nguyen Binh Nghiep
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Phan Ba Ngoc Phuong
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|