VNECO4 Electricity Construction Joint Stock Company (HNX | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Van Huy
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Ngoc An
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy Director
|
8,582
|
0.83 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN THE TAM
|
Member of Management Board
|
4,500
|
0.44 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN VAN BON
|
Member of Management Board
|
1,446
|
0.14 %
|
31/12/2022
|
HO HUU PHUOC
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Van Huy
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Phan Huy Thanh
|
Member of Management Board/Director/Spokesman
|
24,486
|
2.38 %
|
31/12/2019
|
Nguyen Ngoc An
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy Director
|
8,582
|
0.83 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Van Huyen
|
Board member
|
5,144
|
0.50 %
|
31/12/2014
|
NGUYEN THE TAM
|
Member of Management Board
|
4,500
|
0.44 %
|
30/06/2024
|