Urban Development Construction Corporation (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Thai Hoa
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
42,000
|
0.12 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vo Thanh Tai
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Spokesman
|
11,100
|
0.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Ho Thanh Con
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
1,100
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Ho Kien Cuong
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Mai Ngoc Dinh
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Thai Hoa
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
42,000
|
0.12 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Trinh Hang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
11,700
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2015
|
Trieu Bao Kim
|
Board member
|
81,000
|
0.23 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Nguyen The Thuong
|
Member of the Management Board /Member of Supervisors Board
|
40,000
|
0.11 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Vo Thanh Tai
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Spokesman
|
11,100
|
0.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|