Truong Thinh Energy Investment Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Ngoc Tuong
|
|
700,000
|
2.46 %
|
19/12/2019
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Ngoc Tuong
|
|
700,000
|
2.46 %
|
19/12/2019
|
NGUYEN CONG THANH
|
|
50
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Tran Quang Chung
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
1,038,900
|
3.65 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Tran Thanh Hai
|
Member of the Management Board
|
1,250,000
|
4.39 %
|
31/12/2019
|
Nguyen Dinh Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
1,200,000
|
4.21 %
|
31/12/2018
|