Telecommunication Technical Service Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Technology)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vu Viet Bao
|
|
212,100
|
4.42 %
|
16/03/2021
|
Lam Vu Hoang Tung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
250,600
|
5.22 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Nguyen Thanh Hai
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Nguyen Xuan Hien
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
391,400
|
8.15 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Nguyen Van Dan
|
Member of Management Board
|
50,100
|
1.04 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vu Viet Bao
|
|
212,100
|
4.42 %
|
16/03/2021
|
Pham Anh Tuan
|
Chairman of the Board
|
817,500
|
17.03 %
|
30/09/2007
|
Lam Vu Hoang Tung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
250,600
|
5.22 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Nguyen Duc Dong
|
Chairman of the Board/Chief of Executive Officer
|
31,200
|
0.65 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Dang Duc Khoi
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|