Traphaco Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Health Care)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
VU THI THUAN
|
|
471,254
|
1.14 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Nguyen Phu Khanh
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Tuc Ma
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
1,724,456
|
4.16 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Dao Thuy Ha
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
72,990
|
0.18 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Lee Tae Yon
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
VU THI THUAN
|
|
471,254
|
1.14 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Nguyen Thi Mui
|
|
121,840
|
0.29 %
|
08/02/2010
|
Pham Thi Phuong
|
|
39,106
|
0.09 %
|
08/02/2010
|
Nguyen Thi Kim Hoa
|
|
26,031
|
0.06 %
|
08/02/2010
|
Chad Ryan Ovel
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2016
|