Tien Giang Investment and Construction Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Hoang Huan
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/General Director
|
1,192,936
|
4.60 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thanh Nghia
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
1,269,939
|
4.90 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vu Huy Giap
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
1,169,555
|
4.51 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Huong
|
Member of Management Board
|
954,104
|
3.68 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Truong Bich Huyen
|
Head of Supervisors Board/Member of Supervisors Board
|
273,545
|
1.05 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dao Thi Kieu Trinh
|
|
15,610
|
0.06 %
|
31/03/2011
|
Tran Hoang Huan
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/General Director
|
1,192,936
|
4.60 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Van Diep
|
Chairman of the Board
|
292,790
|
1.13 %
|
30/07/2015
|
Le Vinh Hien
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board
|
269,883
|
1.04 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Doan Thanh Dat
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
07/10/2021
|