Thaiholdings Joint Stock Company (HNX | Real Estate)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Duc Thuy
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
22/06/2022
|
Nguyen Chi Kien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
15,608,926
|
4.05 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Van Thuyet
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Vu Thanh Hue
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
NGUYEN VAN KHOA
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Duc Thuy
|
|
85,909,333
|
22.31 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Nguyen Duc Thuy
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
22/06/2022
|
Nguyen Chi Kien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
15,608,926
|
4.05 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Van Thuyet
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
NGUYEN THI PHUONG
|
Member of the Management Board /Chief Accountant
|
539,000
|
0.14 %
|
31/12/2021
|