Tracodi Construction Holdings Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Thi Mai Loan
|
|
4,895,011
|
1.46 %
|
24/08/2022
|
Nguyen The Tai
|
|
646,232
|
0.19 %
|
15/07/2022
|
Nguyen Thanh Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,319,198
|
1.58 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Huynh Thi Kim Tuyen
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
1,086,854
|
0.32 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Dang Khoa
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
162,000
|
0.05 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Thi Mai Loan
|
|
4,895,011
|
1.46 %
|
24/08/2022
|
Nguyen The Tai
|
|
646,232
|
0.19 %
|
15/07/2022
|
Dao Thi Thanh Hien
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
Nguyen Ho Nam
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Vice Chairman of the Management Board /General Director
|
10,537,149
|
3.14 %
|
09/06/2023
|
Nguyen Thanh Hung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,319,198
|
1.58 %
|
30/06/2024
|