Sao Vang Rubber Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Automobiles & Parts)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Hoanh Son
|
Legal Representative /Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Viet Hung
|
General Director /Member of the Management Board
|
12
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thanh Tung
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
7
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Luong Xuan Hoang
|
Member of the Management Board /Head of Internal auditor
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Dinh Son
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Van Hieu
|
|
2,000
|
0.01 %
|
31/12/2010
|
Nguyen Gia Tuong
|
Chairman of the Board
|
99,998
|
0.36 %
|
31/12/2010
|
Le Van Cuong
|
Chairman of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
13,639
|
0.05 %
|
30/06/2015
|
Vu Tien Dung
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
05/05/2011
|
Pham Hoanh Son
|
Legal Representative /Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|