Song Da No11 Joint Stock Company (HNX | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Luu Van Ho
|
|
1,097,384
|
4.54 %
|
01/04/2022
|
Le Van Tuan
|
|
99
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Trinh Trong Hung
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Xuan Hong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
NGUYEN VAN SON
|
Chairman of Management Board/Vice Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/General Director
|
1,054,953
|
4.36 %
|
09/09/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Luu Van Ho
|
|
1,097,384
|
4.54 %
|
01/04/2022
|
Nguyen Bach Duong
|
|
6,850
|
0.03 %
|
06/03/2009
|
Le Van Tuan
|
|
99
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Trinh Trong Hung
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Xuan Hong
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|