Saigon Shipping Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Vice Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
115,360
|
0.80 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Huynh Nhu Y
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
TRAN THIEN
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Pham Van Huong
|
Member of Management Board/Spokesman
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Van Long
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi My Hanh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Le Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Vice Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
115,360
|
0.80 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Do Viet Trieu
|
Chairman of the Board
|
37,265
|
0.26 %
|
16/11/2009
|
Tran Quoc Toan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Le Van Pha
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|