Mien Trung Power Investment and Development Joint Stock Company (HNX | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dinh Quang Chien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
7,991,040
|
24.97 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Minh Tien
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Independent Member of Management Board/Head of Internal auditor
|
101,920
|
0.32 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Dinh Thu Thuy
|
Member of Management Board
|
8,056,000
|
25.18 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Hoai Nam
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
30,200
|
0.09 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vu Quang Sang
|
Member of Management Board
|
12,800
|
0.04 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Dinh Quang Chien
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
7,991,040
|
24.97 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vi Viet Dung
|
|
5,000
|
0.02 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Nguyen Minh Tien
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Independent Member of Management Board/Head of Internal auditor
|
101,920
|
0.32 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Tran Dinh Nhan
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Dinh Thu Thuy
|
Member of Management Board
|
8,056,000
|
25.18 %
|
30/06/2024
|