Can Tho Sadico Joint Stock Corporation (HNX | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Mai Cong Toan
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman
|
952,100
|
9.39 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN PHU THO
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Vice Chairman of the Management Board /General Director
|
155,630
|
1.53 %
|
05/08/2019
|
Nguyen Van Ngu
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Do Huu Huong
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Ngoc Khanh
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Mai Cong Toan
|
Chairman of Management Board/Spokesman
|
952,100
|
9.39 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN PHU THO
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Vice Chairman of the Management Board /General Director
|
155,630
|
1.53 %
|
05/08/2019
|
Le Hoang Tuan
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
600
|
0.01 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Le Ngoc Anh
|
Vice Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board
|
170
|
0 %
|
07/03/2022
|
Luu Van Kinh
|
Member of Management Board
|
2,600
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2019
|