Song Da 3 Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Tien Truong
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Xuan Toan
|
Member of the Management Board /General Director
|
10
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Truong Quoc Hung
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Bui Dinh Dong
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Pham Van Tang
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Van Nghiep
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
10/06/2009
|
Nguyen Khac Hiep
|
Chairman of the Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2008
|
Nguyen Tien Truong
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Hoang Minh Thuan
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
01/01/1900
|
Ninh Duy Phong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|