Refrigeration Electrical Engineering Corporation (HOSE | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Mai Thanh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
60,416,344
|
12.83 %
|
22/07/2024
|
Alain Xavier Cany
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Ngoc Thai Binh
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Chief Financial Officer/Spokesman
|
9,311,998
|
1.98 %
|
22/07/2024
|
Nguyen Ngoc Thai Binh
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Chief Financial Officer/Spokesman
|
6,057,040
|
1.29 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Huynh Thanh Hai
|
Member of Management Board
|
149,744
|
0.03 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Quach Vinh Binh
|
|
101,769
|
0.02 %
|
31/12/2016
|
Dominic Timothy Charles Scriven
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
16/11/2014
|
Nguyen Thi Mai Thanh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
60,416,344
|
12.83 %
|
22/07/2024
|
Alain Xavier Cany
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
David Alexander Newbigging
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2019
|