Viet Property Investment Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Real Estate)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ly Nam Ninh
|
|
227,000
|
0.45 %
|
11/05/2023
|
Bui Quang Minh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
51,200
|
0.10 %
|
30/06/2024
|
TRAN QUOC HUY
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Legal Representative
|
25,300
|
0.05 %
|
16/04/2024
|
Trinh Quoc Khanh
|
Member of Management Board
|
5,182,800
|
10.37 %
|
25/09/2024
|
NGUYEN VIET DUNG
|
Member of Management Board
|
3,983,700
|
7.97 %
|
25/09/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ly Nam Ninh
|
|
227,000
|
0.45 %
|
11/05/2023
|
Tran Thi Nam Thao
|
|
12,800
|
0.03 %
|
03/02/2010
|
Duong Thi Thu Trang
|
|
1,000
|
0 %
|
05/10/2011
|
Nguyen Nam Son
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
03/02/2010
|
Do Van Binh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|