Indochina Petroleum Transportation Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Manh Tuan
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
LE THANH SON
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Luu Manh Thang
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Manh Hung
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Pham Anh Hung
|
Member of the Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vuong Dung Hoang
|
|
2,000
|
0.01 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Duong Thu Huong
|
|
2,000
|
0.01 %
|
15/03/2010
|
Vu Thi Lan Anh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Nguyen Quoc Phuong
|
Chairman of the Board
|
5,490
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Nguyen Chi Dung
|
Chief of Executive Officer
|
2,130
|
0.01 %
|
15/03/2010
|