PetroVietnam Power Corporation (HOSE | Utilities)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Hoang Van Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Ngoc Bich
|
Member of Management Board
|
41,705
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vu Thi To Nga
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Hoang Yen
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Anh Tuan
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Vu Huy An
|
|
54,300
|
0 %
|
30/06/2019
|
Ho Cong Ky
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
53,100
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Hoang Van Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Ngoc Bich
|
Member of Management Board
|
41,705
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Xuan Truong
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
23,100
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|