Post and Telecommunication Equipment Joint Stock Company (HNX | Technology)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Tuan Phong
|
|
14,700
|
0.08 %
|
30/06/2024
|
TRAN HAI VAN
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
203,323
|
1.05 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Duong Trung Loi
|
Member of Management Board
|
2,381,772
|
12.26 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Huyen Son
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
47,394
|
0.24 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Tien Hung
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
23,391
|
0.12 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Tuan Phong
|
|
14,700
|
0.08 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Xuan Hai
|
|
7,300
|
0.04 %
|
30/06/2019
|
To Chi Thanh
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2018
|
TRAN HAI VAN
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
203,323
|
1.05 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Vuong Xuan Hoa
|
Chairman of the Board/Director
|
29,289
|
0.15 %
|
31/12/2014
|