Posts and Telecommunications Material Supply Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Technology)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Ngoc Ninh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|
Ngo Xuan Truong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Doan Minh Don
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board
|
12,950
|
0.72 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Phan Thang
|
Vice Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Hoang Tung Son
|
Member of Management Board
|
37,950
|
2.11 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Do Hoai Phong
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
413,100
|
22.95 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Ly Tri Duc
|
Chairman of Management Board/Vice Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
21,650
|
1.20 %
|
06/07/2016
|
Ngo Xuan Truong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Pham Ngoc Ninh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|
Pham Ngoc Ninh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|