Hong Ha Vietnam Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ha Van Anh
|
|
2,364,000
|
11.82 %
|
29/01/2021
|
Nguyen Thi Thuy Huyen
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
2,486,770
|
12.43 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Thanh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
135,700
|
0.68 %
|
31/12/2023
|
LE VINH VIET
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Vice Chairman of the Management Board /General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
21/04/2022
|
HOANG QUOC HUY
|
Vice Chairman of the Management Board /General Director /Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Ha Van Anh
|
|
2,364,000
|
11.82 %
|
29/01/2021
|
TRINH THANH GIANG
|
|
39,000
|
0.20 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Ngo Thi Duyen
|
|
17,020
|
0.09 %
|
31/12/2020
|
Nguyen Thi Thuy Huyen
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
2,486,770
|
12.43 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Hoang Anh
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director
|
257,100
|
1.29 %
|
08/06/2020
|