Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Major shareholder
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name | Position | Shares Owned | Rate % | Latest Update |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pham Thi Quynh Thu | Chairman of the Management Board /Person in charge of Corporate governace /Legal Representative | 2,363,352 | 11.42 % | 30/06/2024 |
NGUYEN MINH KE | Vice Chairman of Management Board | 1,467,345 | 7.09 % | 31/12/2023 |
Le Van Thang | Legal Representative /General Director /Member of the Management Board | 1,805,661 | 8.73 % | 30/06/2024 |
DO THI THANH TUNG | Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director | 721,634 | 3.49 % | 31/12/2023 |
PHAN TIEN HOA | Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director | 17,250 | 0.08 % | 30/06/2022 |
Resigned board of directors
Full Name | Position | Shares Owned | Rate % | Latest Update |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pham Thi Quynh Thu | Chairman of the Management Board /Person in charge of Corporate governace /Legal Representative | 2,363,352 | 11.42 % | 30/06/2024 |
NGUYEN MINH KE | Vice Chairman of Management Board | 1,467,345 | 7.09 % | 31/12/2023 |
Le Van Thang | Legal Representative /General Director /Member of the Management Board | 1,805,661 | 8.73 % | 30/06/2024 |
DO THI THANH TUNG | Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director | 721,634 | 3.49 % | 31/12/2023 |
Pham Anh Tai | Member of Management Board | 60,980 | 0.29 % | 30/06/2019 |