Nui Nho Stone Joint Stock Company (HOSE | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
MAI VAN CHANH
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Doan Minh Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Lam Thi Mai
|
Member of Management Board
|
740,821
|
3.38 %
|
30/06/2024
|
VU VAN HAI
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Le Viet Chau
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Hong Chau
|
|
7,582
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2019
|
MAI VAN CHANH
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2021
|
Doan Minh Quang
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Lam Thi Mai
|
Member of Management Board
|
740,821
|
3.38 %
|
30/06/2024
|
NGUYEN VAN CHOI
|
Member of Management Board /Deputy Director
|
43,689
|
0.20 %
|
31/12/2021
|