Nam Hoa Trading & Production Corporation (HOSE | Personal & Household Goods)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Duy Anh
|
|
942,264
|
3.92 %
|
04/01/2018
|
DOAN HUONG SON
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,864,212
|
24.41 %
|
31/03/2024
|
Doan Huong Son
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,193,700
|
4.97 %
|
04/01/2018
|
Le Duy Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
3,120,000
|
12.98 %
|
31/03/2024
|
Nguyen Tien Tho
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Person in charge of Corporate governace
|
500,000
|
2.08 %
|
17/05/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Le Duy Anh
|
|
942,264
|
3.92 %
|
04/01/2018
|
DOAN HUONG SON
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
5,864,212
|
24.41 %
|
31/03/2024
|
Doan Huong Son
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
1,193,700
|
4.97 %
|
04/01/2018
|
Ngo Van Hoa
|
Chairman of Management Board/General Director/Director
|
100,000
|
0.42 %
|
11/12/2018
|
Le Duy Anh
|
Member of Management Board
|
3,120,000
|
12.98 %
|
31/03/2024
|