Ninh Binh Phosphate Fertilizer Joint Stock Company (HNX | Chemicals)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Manh Ninh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Director
|
1,573,155
|
10.00 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Ha Huy San
|
Member of Management Board
|
69,607
|
0.44 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Ngoc Thach
|
Member of Management Board
|
32,850
|
0.21 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Duong Nhu Duc
|
Member of Management Board/Director
|
3,280
|
0.02 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Hoang Thi Tiep
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Xuan Quyen
|
|
300
|
0 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Pham Manh Ninh
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Director
|
1,573,155
|
10.00 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Thanh Tung
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
3,982
|
0.03 %
|
31/12/2019
|
Nguyen Van Dong
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
14/05/2019
|
Le Van Cuong
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/05/2015
|