Mineral and Mechanical Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Basic Resources)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Huu Thu
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
821,771
|
24.10 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tang Nguyen Ngoc
|
General Director /Member of the Management Board
|
862,174
|
25.28 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tang Minh Son
|
Member of Management Board
|
375,993
|
11.03 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Tang Minh Ha
|
Member of the Management Board
|
12,072
|
0.35 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tang Van Hai
|
Member of Supervisors Board
|
29,258
|
0.86 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Pham Huu Thu
|
Chairman of the Management Board
|
821,771
|
24.10 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tang Nguyen Ngoc
|
General Director /Member of the Management Board
|
862,174
|
25.28 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Tang Minh Son
|
Member of Management Board
|
375,993
|
11.03 %
|
30/06/2022
|
Vu Truong Son
|
Board member
|
57,007
|
1.67 %
|
31/12/2014
|
Dao Minh Son
|
Board member
|
19,160
|
0.56 %
|
01/07/2010
|