Song Da Mechanical Assembiling Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Construction & Materials)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Khieu Manh Tuan
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Nguyen Viet Dung
|
Member of Management Board
|
365,200
|
4.37 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Le Trong Nghia
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Vu Anh Doan
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Le Van Tam
|
Member of Management Board/General Director/Spokesman
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2023
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Trong Tot
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
06/10/2024
|
Pham Duc Trong
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director/Spokesman
|
127,943
|
1.53 %
|
31/12/2019
|
Tran Thanh Son
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board /General Director
|
54,281
|
0.65 %
|
31/12/2021
|
Nguyen Doan Hanh
|
Chairman of the Board
|
33,940
|
0.41 %
|
04/11/2009
|
Quang Thi Kim Dung
|
Chairman of Management Board/Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2020
|