Lam Thao Fertilizers & Chemicals Joint Stock Company (HNX | Chemicals)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Quoc Anh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
4
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Tran Dai Nghia
|
Member of Management Board/Deputy General Director
|
156
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Pham Thanh Tung
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Bui Son Hai
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Thi Thuy Duong
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Nguyen Thi Van Hoa
|
|
1,272
|
0 %
|
26/02/2015
|
Nguyen Van Hieu
|
|
1,250
|
0 %
|
05/06/2012
|
Nguyen Thi Huong Giang
|
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2013
|
Pham Quang Tuyen
|
Chairman of the Management Board /Member of the Management Board /General Director
|
6,264
|
0.01 %
|
15/02/2022
|
Nguyen Quoc Anh
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
4
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|