LILAMA 45.4 Joint Stock Company (UPCOM | Industrial Goods & Services)
Ownership structure
State ownership
Foreign Ownership
Other
Incumbent board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
Tran Thanh Son
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
HOANG VAN HA
|
Member of the Management Board /Deputy General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
31/12/2022
|
Phan Cao Vien
|
Member of Management Board/General Director
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Viet
|
Member of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Nguyen Van Ngoc
|
Head of Supervisors Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Resigned board of directors
Full Name
|
Position
|
Shares Owned
|
Rate %
|
Latest Update
|
NGUYEN BA SUNG
|
|
99,300
|
2.48 %
|
31/05/2016
|
Hoang Van Du
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
80,000
|
2.00 %
|
01/12/2016
|
Tran Thanh Son
|
Chairman of Management Board
|
0
|
0 %
|
30/06/2024
|
Hoang Tuan Anh
|
Spokesman
|
150,000
|
3.75 %
|
31/05/2016
|
Dang Van Phuc
|
Board member/Chief Accountant
|
32,000
|
0.80 %
|
31/12/2014
|